This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/19/2021 at 07:46:21 (UTC).

PLD USLV NORTHWEST IC LP vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 PLD USLV NORTHWEST IC LP filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DEDRA DAVIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3852

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DEDRA DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PLD USLV NORTHWEST IC LP

PLD USLV NORTHWEST IC II LLC

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS CHIEF

13013 Northwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUMAS, BRITTANY E.

 

Court Documents

Return of Service

09/03/2021: Return of Service

Exhibit A

08/26/2021: Exhibit A

COVER LETTER

08/26/2021: COVER LETTER

PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL PETITION FOR REVIEW OF APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD ORDER

08/26/2021: PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL PETITION FOR REVIEW OF APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURNED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS CHIEF; Issued: 8/27/2021; Served: 9/2/2021; Received: 9/7/2021; Tracking: 73907248; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DUMAS, BRITTANY ELIZABETH; Person Filing: PLD USLV NORTHWEST IC II LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DUMAS, BRITTANY ELIZABETH; Person Filing: PLD USLV NORTHWEST IC LP;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brittany E. Dumas