This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/07/2021 at 07:56:51 (UTC).

PIERSON, KHARISMA vs. CAMPIOTTI, ERIN

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 PIERSON, KHARISMA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CAMPIOTTI, ERIN. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KYLE CARTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8870

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KYLE CARTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PIERSON, KHARISMA

Defendants

CAMPIOTTI, ERIN

Land, TX 77498

AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE AMBULANCE SERVICE, INC.

Other

AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE AMBULANCE SERVICE INC (IS A FOREIGN

211 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VU, VINCENT T.

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Original Petition And Demand For Rule 194 Disclosures

09/13/2021: Plaintiffs Original Petition And Demand For Rule 194 Disclosures

Civil Process Request Form

09/13/2021: Civil Process Request Form

Civil Process Request Form - Company

09/21/2021: Civil Process Request Form - Company

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE AMBULANCE SERVICE INC (IS A FOREIGN; Issued: 10/4/2021; Tracking: 73923484; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CAMPIOTTI, ERIN; Issued: 9/21/2021; Tracking: 73918617; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: VU, VINCENT T.; Person Filing: PIERSON, KHARISMA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Medical Response Ambulance Service, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VU, VINCENT T.