This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 11:38:09 (UTC).

PHU THINH INC vs. J S A CONSTRUCTION

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 PHU THINH INC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against J S A CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7364

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHU THINH INC

Defendants

J S A CONSTRUCTION

AING, MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUNCAN, CHRISTOPHER EDWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2008
  • DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2008
  • PLAINTIFF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED, CASE RETAINED ON DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED, CASE RETAINED ON DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2005
  • ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2005
  • ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - DUNCAN, CHRISTOPHER EDWARD Person Filing - PHU THINH INC

    Read MoreRead Less