This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:13:22 (UTC).

PHILLIPS, CLINTON E vs. CARR, JOSHUA

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 PHILLIPS, CLINTON E filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CARR, JOSHUA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8495

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHILLIPS, CLINTON E

Defendants

CARR, JOSHUA

HABERBUSH, JOHN

HABERBUSH, BETTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PIPKIN, JOHN EMORY

Defendant Attorney

BUJOSA, NINA A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2005
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2004
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2004
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2004
  • ANSWER : Filing Attorney - BUJOSA, NINA A. Person Filing - CARR, JOSHUA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2004
  • ANSWER : Filing Attorney - BUJOSA, NINA A. Person Filing - HABERBUSH, BETTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2004
  • ANSWER : Filing Attorney - BUJOSA, NINA A. Person Filing - HABERBUSH, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PIPKIN, JOHN EMORY Person Filing - PHILLIPS, CLINTON E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PIPKIN, JOHN EMORY Person Filing - PHILLIPS, CLINTON E

    Read MoreRead Less