This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/19/2021 at 07:51:43 (UTC).

PGS IMAGING INC vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 PGS IMAGING INC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE H PALMER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9953

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE H PALMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PGS IMAGING INC

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS

13013 Northwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHEEK, LYNDSEY MICHELLE

Defendant Attorney

BROWN, EMILY

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition

10/25/2021: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Defendant's Original Answer

11/17/2021: Defendant's Original Answer

Affidavit of Service

11/09/2021: Affidavit of Service

Citation

11/09/2021: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BROWN, EMILY; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 10/27/2021; Tracking: 73932571; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CHEEK, LYNDSEY MICHELLE; Person Filing: PGS IMAGING INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN, EMILY