This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/03/2021 at 07:46:40 (UTC).

PEREZ, VIKTORYA LEE (INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE OF vs. CONOCOPHILLIPS INC (D/B/A CONOCOPHILLIPS)

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 PEREZ, VIKTORYA LEE INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE OF filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CONOCOPHILLIPS INC D/B/A CONOCOPHILLIPS. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KYLE CARTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8165

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KYLE CARTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEREZ, VIKTORYA LEE (INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE OF

Defendants

CONOCOPHILLIPS INC (D/B/A CONOCOPHILLIPS)

LYNX PRESSURE SOLUTIONS LLC (D/B/A LYNX ENERGY SERVICES)

CONOCOPHILLIPS

LYNX ENERGY SERVICES

Others

CONOCOPHILLIPS INC (D/B/A CONOCOPHILLIPS)(DELAWARE CORPORATION) MAY BE

1021 Main St Ste 1150

Houston, TX 77002

LYNX PRESSURE SOLUTIONS LLC (D/B/A LYNX ENERGY SERVICES)(TEXAS LIMITED

1445 Ross Ave Ste 2400

Dallas, TX 75202

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FASSOLD, MARK ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Citation

09/21/2021: Citation

Citation Corporate

09/21/2021: Citation Corporate

Citation

09/22/2021: Citation

Citation Corporate

09/22/2021: Citation Corporate

Request for Issuance of Service-Lynx Pressure Solutions

09/10/2021: Request for Issuance of Service-Lynx Pressure Solutions

Request for Issuance of Service-ConocoPhillips

09/10/2021: Request for Issuance of Service-ConocoPhillips

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LYNX PRESSURE SOLUTIONS LLC (D/B/A LYNX ENERGY SERVICES)(TEXAS LIMITED; Issued: 9/17/2021; Served: 9/20/2021; Tracking: 73917574; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CONOCOPHILLIPS INC (D/B/A CONOCOPHILLIPS)(DELAWARE CORPORATION) MAY BE; Issued: 9/17/2021; Served: 9/20/2021; Tracking: 73917567; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FASSOLD, MARK ANTHONY; Person Filing: PEREZ, VIKTORYA LEE (INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE OF;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY is a litigant