This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:03:11 (UTC).

PEREZ, JENNIFER LYNN vs. PEREZ, THOMAS (TOMMY) RAY

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 PEREZ, JENNIFER LYNN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PEREZ, THOMAS TOMMY RAY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0272

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEREZ, JENNIFER LYNN

Defendant

PEREZ, THOMAS (TOMMY) RAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONAS, AARON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2010
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF WAIVER ORDER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED CHANGING NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2005
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2005
  • WAIVER CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - JONAS, AARON Person Filing - PEREZ, JENNIFER LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less