This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 00:27:51 (UTC).

PDVSA SERVICES INC vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 PDVSA SERVICES INC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KYLE CARTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2520

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KYLE CARTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PDVSA SERVICES INC

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS CHIEF

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUTCHISON, WESLEY COLE

Defendant Attorney

OUSLANDER, COREY ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition & Request for Initial Disclosures

01/13/2022: Plaintiff's Original Petition & Request for Initial Disclosures

Exhibit A

01/13/2022: Exhibit A

Defendant's Original Answer

02/17/2022: Defendant's Original Answer

Citation

01/31/2022: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: OUSLANDER, COREY ROBERT; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS CHIEF; Issued: 1/14/2022; Served: 1/28/2022; Returned: 1/28/2022; Received: 1/31/2022; Tracking: 73961041; Deliver To: CONST 1 ALAN ROSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HUTCHISON, WESLEY COLE; Person Filing: PDVSA SERVICES INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PDVSA SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OUSLANDER, COREY ROBERT