This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/20/2018 at 21:51:06 (UTC).

PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. PENA, MARIA DOLORES

Case Summary

On 02/25/2016 PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against PENA, MARIA DOLORES. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are PATRICIA J. KERRIGAN and DEBRA IBARRA MAYFIELD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2034

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

PATRICIA J. KERRIGAN

DEBRA IBARRA MAYFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

4701 Preston Avenue

Pasadena, TX 77505

Defendants and Intervenor Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY

Po Box 3064

Houston, TX 77253

SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

CITY OF HOUSTON

Houston, TX 77253

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

CITY OF HOUSTON TEXAS

PENA, MARIA DOLORES

Alpharetta, GA 30022

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS

SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT BY SERVING MIKE SULLIVAN

1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

Defendant and Intervenor Defendant

PENA, MARIA DOLORES

Alpharetta, GA 30022

Others

HARRIS COUNTY & RELATED TAXING ENTITIES BY SERVING MIKE SULLIVAN TAX

1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

PENA, MARIA DOLORES BY SERVING THE TEXAS SECRETARY OF STATE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOYNER, DEXTER

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III

SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH

WIEHLE, ELIZABETH ANN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST

02/25/2016: CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST

CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

02/25/2016: CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

02/25/2016: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION IN INTERVENTION

03/17/2016: ORIGINAL PETITION IN INTERVENTION

Citation (Tax Suit)

03/29/2016: Citation (Tax Suit)

proposed Order of Partial Dismissal

06/29/2016: proposed Order of Partial Dismissal

Proposed Master in Chancerys Report to the District Court

06/29/2016: Proposed Master in Chancerys Report to the District Court

PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

07/21/2016: PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

Notice of Default Judgment

03/06/2017: Notice of Default Judgment

Original Intervention

03/07/2017: Original Intervention

Exhibit A

03/22/2017: Exhibit A

Proposed Final Judgment

04/12/2017: Proposed Final Judgment

Master's Report

04/12/2017: Master's Report

RE-SET NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

04/17/2017: RE-SET NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

2016-12034 CERTIFIED MAIL

04/19/2017: 2016-12034 CERTIFIED MAIL

NOTICE OF TRIAL JUDGMENT - MARIA DOLORES PENA - Signed

05/23/2017: NOTICE OF TRIAL JUDGMENT - MARIA DOLORES PENA - Signed

Master in Chancery's Report to the District Court

07/19/2017: Master in Chancery's Report to the District Court

FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY)

08/11/2017: FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2017
  • Description: DEFENDANT COSTS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Description: FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY); Order Signed: 8/11/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Description: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RECOMMENDED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Description: HOLD FOR JUDGMENT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Description: JUDGMENT RENDERED BY COURT AFTER TRIAL (NON-JURY);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Description: TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Description: EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Description: MOTION TO DESIGNATE TRIAL READY RESET;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Description: TRIAL RECESSED TO FUTURE DATE (NON-JURY);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Description: EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Description: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Description: TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: WIEHLE, ELIZABETH ANN; Person Filing: CITY OF HOUSTON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • Description: PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION; Order Signed: 7/21/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Description: DISMISSAL RECOMMENDED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH; Person Filing: SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JOYNER, DEXTER; Person Filing: PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less