This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 01/10/2021 at 12:32:49 (UTC).

PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. GARFIAS, ANASTACIO

Case Summary

On 10/09/2015 PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against GARFIAS, ANASTACIO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CORY SEPOLIO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0335

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CORY SEPOLIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Intervenor Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

CITY OF HOUSTON

HARRIS COUNTY

SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

Intervenor Defendants and Defendants

GARFIAS, ANASTACIO

HARRIS COUNTY & RELATED TAXING ENTITIES BY SERVING MIKE SULLIVAN

GARFIAS, YOLANDA S

GRAHAM MORTGAGE CORPORATION (A TEXAS CORPORATION) (LIENHOLDER-IN REM

Others

GRAHAMA MORTGAGE CORPORATION (A TEXAS CORPORATION) (LIENHOLDER-IN REM

HARRIS COUNTY & RELATED COUNTY ENTITIES BY SERVING MIKE SULLIVAN-

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOYNER, DEXTER D.

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III

AUSTIN, GLEN THOMAS JR.

SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT "A"

10/09/2015: EXHIBIT "A"

CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST

10/09/2015: CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST

CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

10/09/2015: CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

10/09/2015: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

Disclaimer of Impleaded Taxing Unit

10/14/2015: Disclaimer of Impleaded Taxing Unit

Citation (Tax Suit)

10/23/2015: Citation (Tax Suit)

Citation (Tax Suit)

10/23/2015: Citation (Tax Suit)

Citation (Tax Suit)

10/26/2015: Citation (Tax Suit)

Exhibit A

02/19/2016: Exhibit A

Civil Process Request

02/19/2016: Civil Process Request

Civil Case Information Sheet

02/19/2016: Civil Case Information Sheet

1st Amended Plaintiff's Original Petition

02/19/2016: 1st Amended Plaintiff's Original Petition

Citation (Tax Suit)

03/28/2016: Citation (Tax Suit)

Citation (Tax Suit)

03/28/2016: Citation (Tax Suit)

Citation (Tax Suit)

04/14/2016: Citation (Tax Suit)

Citation (Tax Suit)

04/14/2016: Citation (Tax Suit)

Civil Process Request

01/31/2017: Civil Process Request

Citation (Tax Suit)

06/14/2017: Citation (Tax Suit)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketType of Service: ORDER OF SALE (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: EXECUTION ORDER OF SALE; Person: GARFIAS, ANASTACIO; Issued: 4/11/2018; Tracking: 73481703; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketDescription: DEFENDANT COSTS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketDescription: FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY); Order Signed: 2/26/2018;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT RENDERED BY COURT AFTER TRIAL (NON-JURY);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketDescription: HOLD FOR JUDGMENT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RECOMMENDED;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • HearingCourt: 555; Docket Type: Tax Docket (Trial); Reason: Trial on Merits; Results: Trial Commenced; Requesting Party: JOYNER, DEXTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketDescription: TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketDescription: EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2017
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GRAHAMA MORTGAGE CORPORATION (A TEXAS CORPORATION) (LIENHOLDER-IN REM; Issued: 2/8/2017; Served: 4/4/2017; Tracking: 73338557; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GARFIAS, YOLANDA S; Issued: 2/24/2016; Served: 3/17/2016; Tracking: 73219674; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GARFIAS, ANASTACIO; Issued: 2/24/2016; Served: 3/17/2016; Tracking: 73219673; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JOYNER, DEXTER D.; Person Filing: PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GRAHAMA MORTGAGE CORPORATION (A TEXAS CORPORATION) (LIENHOLDER-IN REM; Issued: 10/12/2015; Tracking: 73177986; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GRAHAMA MORTGAGE CORPORATION (A TEXAS CORPORATION) (LIENHOLDER-IN REM; Issued: 10/12/2015; Tracking: 73177714; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GARFIAS, YOLANDA S; Issued: 10/12/2015; Tracking: 73177713; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY & RELATED COUNTY ENTITIES BY SERVING MIKE SULLIVAN-; Issued: 10/12/2015; Tracking: 73177712; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GARFIAS, ANASTACIO; Issued: 10/12/2015; Tracking: 73177711; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JOYNER, DEXTER D.; Person Filing: PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less