This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/18/2018 at 05:07:31 (UTC).

PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. ESPINOZA, OSVALDO GARZA

Case Summary

On 02/16/2016 PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against ESPINOZA, OSVALDO GARZA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SYLVIA A. MATTHEWS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9502

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SYLVIA A. MATTHEWS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

4701 Preston Avenue

Pasadena, TX 77505

Defendants and Intervenor Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

CITY OF PASADENA

ESPINOZA, OSVALDO GARZA

Pasadena, TX 77502

CITY OF PASADENA TEXAS

HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS

SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT BY SERVING MIKE SULLIVAN

1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant and Intervenor Defendant

ESPINOZA, OSVALDO GARZA

Pasadena, TX 77502

Other

HARRIS COUNTY & RELATED TAXING ENTITIES BY SERVING MIKE SULLIVAN-

1001 Preston First Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOYNER, DEXTER

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III

SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Activity

01/03/2016: Notice of Activity

CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST

02/16/2016: CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST

CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

02/16/2016: CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

Citation (Tax Suit)

03/07/2016: Citation (Tax Suit)

Mailing Envelope

03/08/2016: Mailing Envelope

Exhibit: Tax Office Payment Agreement

03/08/2016: Exhibit: Tax Office Payment Agreement

Defendants Original Answer

03/08/2016: Defendants Original Answer

Citation

03/16/2016: Citation

ORIGINAL PETITION IN INTERVENTION

03/17/2016: ORIGINAL PETITION IN INTERVENTION

Citation (Tax Suit)

03/29/2016: Citation (Tax Suit)

Original Intervention For Taxes And Claim For city Of Pasadena Special Assessments

06/10/2016: Original Intervention For Taxes And Claim For city Of Pasadena Special Assessments

TRIAL SETTING

06/27/2016: TRIAL SETTING

NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

12/21/2016: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

Notice of Dismissal

12/21/2016: Notice of Dismissal

Proposed Order of Dismissal

01/19/2017: Proposed Order of Dismissal

Motion for Rule 162 Dismissal

01/19/2017: Motion for Rule 162 Dismissal

Notice of Nonsuit

01/19/2017: Notice of Nonsuit

NO COSTS ALLOCATED

01/24/2017: NO COSTS ALLOCATED

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2017
  • Description: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162); Order Signed: 1/24/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Description: NO COSTS ALLOCATED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Description: HOLD FOR JUDGMENT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • Description: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162); Order Signed: 12/21/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • Description: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: CITY OF PASADENA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH; Person Filing: SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: ESPINOZA, OSVALDO GARZA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JOYNER, DEXTER; Person Filing: PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.