This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 12:15:49 (UTC).

PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT OF vs. SCHMIDT, WILLIAM MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT OF filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against SCHMIDT, WILLIAM MICHAEL. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9428

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT OF HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS

CITY OF PASADENA

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY EDUCATION DEPARTMENT

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

SCHMIDT, WILLIAM MICHAEL

SCHMIDT, KATHLEEN ELLEN

STATE OF TEXAS

HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS

PORT OF HOUSTON OF HARRIS COUNTY AUTHORITY

CITY OF PASADENA TEXAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOYNER, DEXTER

LINEBARGER, GOGGAN BLAIR & SAMPSON

SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2006
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2006
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2005
  • PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2004
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH Person Filing - SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2004
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III Person Filing - CITY OF PASADENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2004
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2004
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2004
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2004
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY EDUCATION DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2004
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III Person Filing - PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - JOYNER, DEXTER Person Filing - PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT OF HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less