This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 12:15:31 (UTC).

PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT OF vs. BROUSSARD, GARY L

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT OF filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against BROUSSARD, GARY L. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9426

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT OF HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS

SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

CITY OF PASADENA

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY EDUCATION DEPARTMENT

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

BROUSSARD, GARY L

STATE OF TEXAS

HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS

PORT OF HOUSTON OF HARRIS COUNTY AUTHORITY

CITY OF PASADENA TEXAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOYNER, DEXTER

SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH

LINEBARGER, GOGGAN BLAIR & SAMPSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2006
  • DEFENDANT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2006
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2006
  • ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RECOMMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2006
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2006
  • JUDGMENT RENDERED BY COURT AFTER TRIAL (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2006
  • TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2006
  • STENO RECORD MADE (TAX)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2006
  • EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2006
  • MOTION TO RETAIN RECOMMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2004
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH Person Filing - SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2004
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2004
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2004
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY EDUCATION DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2004
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III Person Filing - PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2004
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III Person Filing - CITY OF PASADENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2004
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - JOYNER, DEXTER Person Filing - PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT OF HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less