This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:01:48 (UTC).

PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT OF vs. A E ASSOCIATES INC (A DEFUNCT TEXAS CORP

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT OF filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against A E ASSOCIATES INC A DEFUNCT TEXAS CORP. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0195

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT OF HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS

CITY OF PASADENA

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY EDUCATION DEPARTMENT

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

A E ASSOCIATES INC (A DEFUNCT TEXAS CORPORATION)

STATE OF TEXAS

HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS

PORT OF HOUSTON OF HARRIS COUNTY AUTHORITY

CITY OF PASADENA TEXAS

F D I C (AS RECEIVER FOR: WESTERN BANK-WESTWOOD)(LIENHOLDER)

ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (IN REM ONLY)

FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION (IN ITS CORPORATE CAPACITY)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOYNER, DEXTER

LINEBARGER, GOGGAN BLAIR & SAMPSON

SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH

Defendant Attorneys

FUERTES, SUSAN RAE

DAVIDSON, ROBERT III

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2006
  • DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2006
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2005
  • ANSWER : Filing Attorney - FUERTES, SUSAN RAE Person Filing - ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (IN REM ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • DISCLAIMER : Filing Attorney - DAVIDSON, ROBERT III Person Filing - F D I C (AS RECEIVER FOR: WESTERN BANK-WESTWOOD)(LIENHOLDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • DISCLAIMER : Filing Attorney - DAVIDSON, ROBERT III Person Filing - FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION (IN ITS CORPORATE CAPACITY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2005
  • DISCLAIMER : Filing Attorney - DAVIDSON, ROBERT III Person Filing - FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION (IN ITS CORPORATE CAPACITY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2005
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH Person Filing - SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2005
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - PARMAR, PANKA J. R. Person Filing - CITY OF PASADENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2005
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - PARMAR, PANKA J. R. Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2005
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - PARMAR, PANKA J. R. Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2005
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - PARMAR, PANKA J. R. Person Filing - PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2005
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - PARMAR, PANKA J. R. Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2005
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - PARMAR, PANKA J. R. Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY EDUCATION DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - JOYNER, DEXTER Person Filing - PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT OF HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less