This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:01:37 (UTC).

PARISH, ANDREA T vs. PARISH, DANE B

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 PARISH, ANDREA T filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PARISH, DANE B. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7198

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARISH, ANDREA T

Defendant

PARISH, DANE B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCNAMARA, BRIAN JUDE

Defendant Attorney

HUBBARD, PATRICK G.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2005
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF WAIVER ORDER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2005
  • EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2005
  • SETTLED/NON-SUITED (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING ASSIGNMENT OF WAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2005
  • ORDER SGND GRNTG QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2005
  • TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2005
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2005
  • MOTION TO RETAIN GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HUBBARD, PATRICK G. Person Filing - PARISH, DANE B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCNAMARA, BRIAN JUDE Person Filing - PARISH, ANDREA T

    Read MoreRead Less