This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:26:54 (UTC).

PARDUE, MICKEL vs. TEXACO INC

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 PARDUE, MICKEL filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against TEXACO INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8695

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARDUE, MICKEL

Defendants

TEXACO INC

AIR LIQUIDE AMERICA CORP

ALLIED CHEMICAL CORP

ALLIEDSIGNAL INC

AMERICAN CYANAMID CO

AMERIPOL SYNPOL CORP

AMOCO CHEMICAL CO

AMOCO OIL CO

ARCO CHEMICAL CO

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD CO

B A S F CORP

B F GOODRICH CORP

B P EXPLORATION & OIL INC

B P OIL CORP

BEAZER EAST INC

BEAZER MATERIALS & SERVICES INC

BIG THREE INDUSTRIES INC

BRIDGESTONE FIRESTONE INC

CANADIANOXY OFFSHORE PRODUCTION CO

60 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIBLIN, AARYN KEMP

Defendant Attorneys

BREM, MICHAEL LAMAR

KROGER, BILL

Other Attorneys

OGDEN, TODD DUANE

MOIR, PETER A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2010
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2005
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2005
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2005
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - OGDEN, TODD DUANE Person Filing - UNIROYAL HOLDINGS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - OGDEN, TODD DUANE Person Filing - UNIROYAL HOLDINGS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2005
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - MOIR, PETER A. Person Filing - OWENS ILLINOIS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MOIR, PETER A. Person Filing - OWENS ILLINOIS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2005
  • AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - MOBILE OIL REFINING CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2005
  • AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - MOBILE CHEMICAL CO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GIBLIN, AARYN KEMP Person Filing - PARDUE, MICKEL

    Read MoreRead Less