Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:48:42 (UTC).

PARAMO-ZAMORA, J. JESUS vs. LUCAS, VIVIAN

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 PARAMO-ZAMORA, J JESUS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LUCAS, VIVIAN. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TANYA GARRISON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9567

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TANYA GARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARAMO-ZAMORA, J. JESUS

Defendant

LUCAS, VIVIAN

Fresno, TX 77545

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KIESCHNICK, JONATHAN C

KIESCHNICK, JONATHAN CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorney

LANZA, NICHOLAS J.

 

Court Documents

Defendant Viviian Lucas Jury Demand

04/24/2020: Defendant Viviian Lucas Jury Demand

Defendant Vivian Lucas Original Answer

04/24/2020: Defendant Vivian Lucas Original Answer

Rule 11 Agreement

05/26/2020: Rule 11 Agreement

Citation Return

04/08/2020: Citation Return

Civil Process Request

03/26/2020: Civil Process Request

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PEITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

03/26/2020: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PEITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LANZA, NICHOLAS J.; Person Filing: LUCAS, VIVIAN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LUCAS, VIVIAN; Issued: 3/30/2020; Served: 3/31/2020; Tracking: 73739079; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: KIESCHNICK, JONATHAN CHRISTOPHER; Person Filing: PARAMO-ZAMORA, J. JESUS;

    Read MoreRead Less