This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 05:50:20 (UTC).

PANALPINA AND DSV PANALPINA vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 PANALPINA AND DSV PANALPINA filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIKE ENGELHART. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2646

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MIKE ENGELHART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PANALPINA AND DSV PANALPINA

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT (A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE

13013 Northwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANNAGAN, JAMES DAVID

Defendant Attorney

BROWN, EMILY

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition

01/14/2022: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Exhibit A

01/14/2022: Exhibit A

Request for Issuance of Service

01/14/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

02/08/2022: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

Defendant's Original Answer

02/02/2022: Defendant's Original Answer

Citation

01/24/2022: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2023
  • HearingCourt: 151; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • HearingCourt: 151; Docket Type: Trial Coordinators Docket; Reason: DOCKET CALL (MOTION FOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 2/8/2022;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BROWN, EMILY; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT (A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE; Issued: 1/14/2022; Served: 1/20/2022; Tracking: 73961202; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HANNAGAN, JAMES DAVID; Person Filing: PANALPINA AND DSV PANALPINA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN, EMILY