Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 02/06/2021 at 07:54:07 (UTC).

PALMER, MICHAEL (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS LEGAL GUARDIAN OF E P) (A MINOR) vs. CS RESTAURANTS INC (D/B/A WENDY'S)

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 PALMER, MICHAEL INDIVIDUALLY AND AS LEGAL GUARDIAN OF E P A MINOR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CS RESTAURANTS INC D/B/A WENDY'S. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RABEEA COLLIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2062

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RABEEA COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PALMER, MICHAEL (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS LEGAL GUARDIAN OF E P) (A MINOR)

PALMER, PERI (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS LEGAL GUARDIAN OF E P) (A MINOR)

PXXXXX, EXXXX (A MINOR)

Defendants

CS RESTAURANTS INC (D/B/A WENDY'S)

WENDY'S

Guardian Ad Litem

GREEN, DAVIDA NECOL

Houston, TX 77044

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOONE, ANGELA RENEE

1900 West Loop

Houston, TX 77027

Defendant Attorney

NICHOLAS, TOLLIE BURL JR.

4101 Mcewen Roa

Dallas, TX 75244

 

Court Documents

Defendant CS Restaurants, Inc. d/b/a Wendy's Original Answer

01/14/2021: Defendant CS Restaurants, Inc. d/b/a Wendy's Original Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM GRANTED; Order Signed: 1/28/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: SENSITIVE DATA INCLUDED IN DOCUMENT; Order Signed: 1/28/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: NICHOLAS, TOLLIE BURL JR.; Person Filing: WENDY'S;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: NICHOLAS, TOLLIE BURL JR.; Person Filing: CS RESTAURANTS INC (D/B/A WENDY'S);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BOONE, ANGELA RENEE; Person Filing: PALMER, MICHAEL (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS LEGAL GUARDIAN OF E P) (A MINOR);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BOONE, ANGELA RENEE; Person Filing: PALMER, PERI (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS LEGAL GUARDIAN OF E P) (A MINOR);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BOONE, ANGELA RENEE; Person Filing: PXXXXX, EXXXX (A MINOR);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE WENDY'S COMPANY is a litigant