This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/16/2021 at 04:59:13 (UTC).

PAK, RUTIT vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE; ATTN: EXPUN

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 PAK, RUTIT filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE ATTN EXPUN. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN REEDER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8264

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN REEDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAK, RUTIT

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE; ATTN: EXPUN

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE; ATTN: EXPUNCTIONS

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT; ATTN: EXPUNCTIONS

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY CRIME RECORDS SERVICE MSC 0234

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER (TCIC)

NATIONAL CRIME INFORMATION CENTER (NCIC)

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION; ATTN: E-FILE & RE: SEARCHTX

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT; ATTN: EXPUNCTIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN, JAY BLASS

917 Franklin S

Houston, TX 77002

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • HearingCourt: 234; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 5/13/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: COHEN, JAY BLASS; Person Filing: PAK, RUTIT;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL CRIME INFORMATION CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION - LEGAL DIVISION is a litigant

Latest cases where HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT is a litigant