Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 10:42:41 (UTC).

PAGTALUNAN, REYNALDO MALATI vs. A K STEEL CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/10/2004 PAGTALUNAN, REYNALDO MALATI filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against A K STEEL CORPORATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******693K

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2004

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAGTALUNAN, REYNALDO MALATI

PAGTALUNAN, MARIA FE P

Defendants

A K STEEL CORPORATION

A O SMITH CORPORATION

A W CHESTERTON

ABNEY MILLS

ALBANY INTERNATIONAL

ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA L L C

ALLIED CHEMICAL CORPORATION

ALLIS CHALMERS CORPORATION

AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY

AMERICAN LOCOMOTIVE (FKA ALCO PRODUCTS INC)

ALCO PRODUCTS INC

AMERICAN STANDARD INC

AMOCO CHEMICAL COMPANY

AMOCO CORPORATION

AMOCO OIL COMPANY

AMOCO OLEFINS CORPORATION

AMOCO PRODUCTION COMPANY

AMTEK INC

174 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUNYAN, MICHAEL THOMAS

Defendant Attorney

HUEBER, SUSAN JAN

Other Attorneys

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

PIPKIN, JOHN EMORY

CLARK, SANDRA FRENCH

TIDWELL, JOHN L.

IRVIN, JASON JAMES

CROUCH, HUBERT A. III

RICE, B. STEVE

LEDYARD, DAVID W.

BARRON, BARBARA JANE

FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM

ROSS, JOHN BULKLEY

STEELE, KYLE C.

FRASE, LAURA ANN

THACKSTON, ROBERT EDWIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2013
  • PARTIAL REMOVAL TO BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2011
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2010
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PIPKIN, JOHN EMORY Person Filing - DIXIE CHEMICAL COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • PARTIAL REMOVAL TO BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2008
  • AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ROSS, JOHN BULKLEY Person Filing - UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2007
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2007
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2007
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2004
  • SEVERANCE : Filing Attorney - RUNYAN, MICHAEL THOMAS Person Filing - PAGTALUNAN, MARIA FE P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2004
  • SEVERANCE : Filing Attorney - RUNYAN, MICHAEL THOMAS Person Filing - PAGTALUNAN, REYNALDO MALATI

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMTEK INC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMOCO OLEFINS CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMOCO OIL COMPANY is a litigant