This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/12/2023 at 07:25:57 (UTC).

OXEA CORPORATION D/B/A OQ CHEMICALS CORPORATION vs. CHAUCER SYNDICATES LIMITED

Case Summary

On 02/16/2023 OXEA CORPORATION D/B/A OQ CHEMICALS CORPORATION filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CHAUCER SYNDICATES LIMITED. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CORY SEPOLIO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0368

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CORY SEPOLIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OXEA CORPORATION D/B/A OQ CHEMICALS CORPORATION

OQ CHEMICALS CORPORATION

Defendants

CHAUCER SYNDICATES LIMITED

RENAISSANCERE SYNDICATE MANAGEMENT LIMITED

BRIT SYNDICATES LIMITED

HAMILTON MANAGING AGENCY LIMITED

LIBERTY MANAGING AGENCY LIMITED

EUCLID ENVIANT LLC

Others

CHAUCER SYNDICATES LIMITED MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING

RENAISSANCERE SYNDICATE MANAGEMENT LIMITEDMAY BE SERVED BY SERVING

BRIT SYNDICATES LIMITED MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING

HAMILTON MANAGING AGENCY LIMITEDMAY BE SERVED BY SERVING

LIBERTY MANAGING AGENCY LIMITED MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING

EUCLID ENVIANT LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDERSON, ARIELLE S

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

02/16/2023: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

02/16/2023: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

02/16/2023: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

02/16/2023: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

02/16/2023: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

02/16/2023: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

Civil Case Information Sheet

02/16/2023: Civil Case Information Sheet

Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure

02/16/2023: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure

Citation - Euclid Enviant LLC

03/01/2023: Citation - Euclid Enviant LLC

Return of Service

03/02/2023: Return of Service

Return of Service

03/02/2023: Return of Service

Citation - Liberty Managing Agency Limited

03/02/2023: Citation - Liberty Managing Agency Limited

Citation - Renaissancere Syndicate Management Limited

03/02/2023: Citation - Renaissancere Syndicate Management Limited

Citation - Brit Syndicates Limited

03/02/2023: Citation - Brit Syndicates Limited

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/16/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: EUCLID ENVIANT LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 2/20/2023; Served: 2/24/2023; Tracking: 74113314; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION(NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LIBERTY MANAGING AGENCY LIMITED MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING; Issued: 2/20/2023; Served: 2/27/2023; Tracking: 74113313; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION(NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HAMILTON MANAGING AGENCY LIMITEDMAY BE SERVED BY SERVING; Issued: 2/20/2023; Served: 2/27/2023; Tracking: 74113312; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION(NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BRIT SYNDICATES LIMITED MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING; Issued: 2/20/2023; Served: 2/27/2023; Tracking: 74113311; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION(NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RENAISSANCERE SYNDICATE MANAGEMENT LIMITEDMAY BE SERVED BY SERVING; Issued: 2/20/2023; Served: 2/27/2023; Tracking: 74113310; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION(NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CHAUCER SYNDICATES LIMITED MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING; Issued: 2/20/2023; Served: 2/27/2023; Tracking: 74113309; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2023

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ANDERSON, ARIELLE S; Person Filing: OQ CHEMICALS CORPORATION;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2023

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ANDERSON, ARIELLE S; Person Filing: OXEA CORPORATION D/B/A OQ CHEMICALS CORPORATION;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less