This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:22:36 (UTC).

OWENS, CECIL A vs. ZURN INDUSTRIES INC

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 OWENS, CECIL A filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against ZURN INDUSTRIES INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0689

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

OWENS, CECIL A

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (FOREIGN CORPORATION)

ZURN INDUSTRIES INC

ZURN INDUSTRIES INC (AKA AND SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ERIE CITY IRON

ERIE CITY IRON WORKS

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (DBA UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION CHEMICALS

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS

A M F INCORPORATED

AQUA CHEM INC (DBA CLEAVER BROOKS DIVISION)

CLEAVER BROOKS DIVISION

AUSTIN CO

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

CRANE COMPANY

DANA CORPORATION

FLUOR CORPORATION

FLOUR ENTERPRISES INC (DBA FLUOR DANIEL )

FLUOR DANIEL

SANTA FE BRAUN INC (FKA C F BRAUN & COMPANY)

C F BRAUN & COMPANY

TH AGRICULTURE & NUTRITION CO L L C

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARTIDA-KIPNESS, ROBBIE S.

Defendant Attorneys

ANDREWS, PATRICIA KAY

ELLISTON, GARY D.

ESCOVER, JOHN WILLIAM

ADAMS, KENT M.

SHEEHY, RICHARD A.

Other Attorneys

MOORE, RANDY EDWARD

PAPPAS, GEORGE P.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2015
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2006
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PAPPAS, GEORGE P. Person Filing - FBCO INC (FKA NATKIN SERVICE COMPANY (FKA NATKIN SERVICE COMPANY OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ANDREWS, PATRICIA KAY Person Filing - GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (FOREIGN CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2005
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - ANDREWS, PATRICIA KAY Person Filing - GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (FOREIGN CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - ANDREWS, PATRICIA KAY Person Filing - GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (FOREIGN CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - COLLEY, CHRISTOPHER CHAMBLIS Person Filing - OWENS, CECIL A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2005
  • MOTION TRANSFER VENUE : Filing Attorney - MOORE, RANDY EDWARD Person Filing - U S CONSTRACTORS LTD (FKA U S CONTRACTORS MERGER LTD SUCCESSOR IN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MOORE, RANDY EDWARD Person Filing - U S CONSTRACTORS LTD (FKA U S CONTRACTORS MERGER LTD SUCCESSOR IN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2005
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - MOORE, RANDY EDWARD Person Filing - U S CONSTRACTORS LTD (FKA U S CONTRACTORS MERGER LTD SUCCESSOR IN

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2005
  • ANSWER : Filing Attorney - LOWERY, JAMES A. III Person Filing - CRANE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ADAMS, KENT M. Person Filing - FLOUR ENTERPRISES INC (DBA FLUOR DANIEL )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LEVINE, TORI SMITH Person Filing - A M F INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SHEEHY, RICHARD A. Person Filing - SANTA FE BRAUN INC (FKA C F BRAUN & COMPANY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SHEEHY, RICHARD A. Person Filing - C F BRAUN & COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - DANA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (DBA UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION CHEMICALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ESCOVER, JOHN WILLIAM Person Filing - AUSTIN CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PARTIDA-KIPNESS, ROBBIE S. Person Filing - OWENS, CECIL A

    Read MoreRead Less