This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/15/2021 at 07:17:29 (UTC).

OVATION SERVICES LLC vs. MOORE, CHRIS E

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 OVATION SERVICES LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against MOORE, CHRIS E. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0938

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OVATION SERVICES LLC

Defendant

MOORE, CHRIS E

Baytown, TX 77521

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DITTLINGER, STEPHEN L.

 

Court Documents

Return of Service

10/01/2021: Return of Service

Citation (Tax Suit)

10/06/2021: Citation (Tax Suit)

Request For Issuance Of Service

09/21/2021: Request For Issuance Of Service

Original Petition For Judicial Foreclosure Of Transferred Tax Liens

09/21/2021: Original Petition For Judicial Foreclosure Of Transferred Tax Liens

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MOORE, CHRIS E; Issued: 9/21/2021; Served: 10/2/2021; Tracking: 73918663; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DITTLINGER, STEPHEN L.; Person Filing: OVATION SERVICES LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ovation Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DITTLINGER, STEPHEN L.