This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/04/2021 at 07:38:59 (UTC).

OVATION SERVICES LLC vs. ALIX, CORNELIUS G

Case Summary

On 10/11/2021 OVATION SERVICES LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against ALIX, CORNELIUS G. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JACLANEL M. MCFARLAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6425

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JACLANEL M. MCFARLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OVATION SERVICES LLC

Defendants

ALIX, CORNELIUS G

Houston, TX 77051

ALIX, WANDA (IN REM)

Houston, TX 77051

CITY OF HOUSTON

HOUSTON ISD

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL

HOUSTON PORT AUTHORITY

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY EDUCATION DEPARTMENT

HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DITTLINGER, STEPHEN L.

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION FOR JUDICIAL FORECLOSURE OF TRANSFERRED TAX LIENS

10/11/2021: ORIGINAL PETITION FOR JUDICIAL FORECLOSURE OF TRANSFERRED TAX LIENS

Request for Issuance of Service

10/11/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

10/11/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Return Of Service re: Harris County Tax Assessor

10/26/2021: Return Of Service re: Harris County Tax Assessor

Citation Return re: Alix, Wanda (in rem)

10/21/2021: Citation Return re: Alix, Wanda (in rem)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ALIX, WANDA (IN REM); Issued: 10/12/2021; Served: 10/19/2021; Tracking: 73926352; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ALIX, CORNELIUS G; Issued: 10/12/2021; Tracking: 73926351; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DITTLINGER, STEPHEN L.; Person Filing: OVATION SERVICES LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOUSTON PORT AUTHORITY is a litigant

Latest cases where Ovation Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY EDUCATION DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where Harris County Hospital District is a litigant