This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/24/2018 at 09:43:59 (UTC).

OSAYANDE, PATRICK OSAROBO vs. PROLOG SERVICES INC (D/B/A PSI OCEAN FRE

Case Summary

On 03/09/2016 OSAYANDE, PATRICK OSAROBO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROLOG SERVICES INC D/B/A PSI OCEAN FRE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE H PALMER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5262

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE H PALMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OSAYANDE, PATRICK OSAROBO

Pearland, TX 77581

Defendants

EGBO, STANLEY

Houston, TX 77063

PROLOG SERVICES INC (D/B/A PSI OCEAN FREIGHT SYSTEMS)

PSI OCEAN FREIGHT SYSTEMS

Other

PROLOG SERVICES INC (IS A TEXAS CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEST, BENJAMIN H. II

Defendant Attorney

SEELE, WILLIAM HAYS

 

Court Documents

Exhibit A

03/09/2016: Exhibit A

Plaintiff's Original Petition

03/09/2016: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Civil Process Request

04/06/2016: Civil Process Request

Citation Corporate

05/02/2016: Citation Corporate

Citation (Executed)

05/02/2016: Citation (Executed)

Original Answer To Defendant Prolog Services, Inc DBA Psi Ocean Freight Systems

06/20/2016: Original Answer To Defendant Prolog Services, Inc DBA Psi Ocean Freight Systems

Original Answer of Defendant Stanley Egbo

06/20/2016: Original Answer of Defendant Stanley Egbo

DCA Generic Letter

06/29/2016: DCA Generic Letter

proposed Docket Control Order

07/28/2016: proposed Docket Control Order

Plaintiff's Designation of Expert Witnesses

01/11/2017: Plaintiff's Designation of Expert Witnesses

DCA Generic Letter

05/17/2017: DCA Generic Letter

Proposed Order Granting Agreed First Motion for Continuance

06/01/2017: Proposed Order Granting Agreed First Motion for Continuance

Agreed First Motion for Continuance

06/01/2017: Agreed First Motion for Continuance

ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

06/02/2017: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Order Of Dismissal

07/03/2017: Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Order Of Dismissal

DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES

07/06/2017: DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES

Civil Case Information Sheet

03/09/2016: Civil Case Information Sheet

ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL

07/14/2017: ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2017
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL; Order Signed: 7/14/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Description: DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES; Order Signed: 7/6/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Description: EACH PAY OWN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE; Order Signed: 6/2/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Description: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 7/29/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SEELE, WILLIAM HAYS; Person Filing: PROLOG SERVICES INC (D/B/A PSI OCEAN FREIGHT SYSTEMS);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SEELE, WILLIAM HAYS; Person Filing: EGBO, STANLEY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SEELE, WILLIAM HAYS; Person Filing: PSI OCEAN FREIGHT SYSTEMS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BEST, BENJAMIN H. II; Person Filing: OSAYANDE, PATRICK OSAROBO;

    Read MoreRead Less