This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/20/2020 at 07:34:41 (UTC).

ORTIZ, GONZALO vs. OWENS, CARLTON

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 ORTIZ, GONZALO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OWENS, CARLTON. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1657

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORTIZ, GONZALO

Defendant

OWENS, CARLTON

Houston, TX 77018

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GALINDO, CRISTOBAL M

 

Court Documents

Return of Service-Carlton Owens.

06/11/2020: Return of Service-Carlton Owens.

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

05/26/2020: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

05/26/2020: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OWENS, CARLTON; Issued: 6/1/2020; Served: 6/11/2020; Tracking: 73753934; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GALINDO, CRISTOBAL M; Person Filing: ORTIZ, GONZALO;

    Read MoreRead Less