This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/07/2021 at 07:40:03 (UTC).

OROZCO, STEVENS vs. TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 OROZCO, STEVENS filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN REEDER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8752

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN REEDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OROZCO, STEVENS

Defendants

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE

P.O. Box 4004,

Huntsville, TX 77342

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

HARRIS COUNTY CENTRAL TECHNOLOGY SERVICES

406 Caroline St.,

Houston, TX 77002

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF?S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

CITY OF HOUSTON LEGAL DEPARTMENT

Houston, TX 77001

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL

HARRIS COUNTY TREASURER

1001 Preston,

Houston, TX 77002

Others

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRACTION SERVICING MARGIE JOHNSON

205 W 14Th Street Suite 600

Austin, TX 78701

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker St

Houston, TX 77002

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS

1200 Travis St

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

201 Caroline 2Nd Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE

1201 Franklin St

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR

1201 Franklin St 12Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JENNINGS, SARAH MAE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • HearingCourt: 234; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY TREASURER; Issued: 9/20/2021; Tracking: 73918021; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CITY OF HOUSTON LEGAL DEPARTMENT; Issued: 9/20/2021; Tracking: 73918020; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CENTRAL TECHNOLOGY SERVICES; Issued: 9/20/2021; Tracking: 73918019; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE; Issued: 9/20/2021; Tracking: 73918018; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR; Issued: 9/20/2021; Tracking: 73915314; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE; Issued: 9/20/2021; Tracking: 73915312; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 9/20/2021; Tracking: 73915310; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS; Issued: 9/20/2021; Tracking: 73915309; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 9/20/2021; Tracking: 73915306; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRACTION SERVICING MARGIE JOHNSON; Issued: 9/20/2021; Tracking: 73915305; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 9/20/2021; Tracking: 73915304; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 9/16/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JENNINGS, SARAH MAE; Person Filing: OROZCO, STEVENS;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRACTION SERVICING MARGIE JOHNSON is a litigant

Latest cases where Texas Department of Criminal Justice - Parole Division is a litigant

Latest cases where OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION - LEGAL DIVISION is a litigant