This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:26:01 (UTC).

O'QUINN, CHARLIE vs. TEXACO INC

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 O'QUINN, CHARLIE filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against TEXACO INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8689

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

O'QUINN, CHARLIE

Defendants

BIG THREE INDUSTRIES INC

CANADIANOXY OFFSHORE PRODUCTION CO

CHAMPION INTERNATIONAL CORP

CHEVRON CHEMICAL CO

CHEVRON USA INC

CITGO PETROLEUM CORP

CITIES SERVICES CO

DOW CHEMICAL CO DELAWARE

DOW CHEMICAL CO

UNIROYAL INC

UNITED STATES STEEL CORP

UNOCAL CORP

VELSICOL CHEMICAL CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIBLIN, AARYN KEMP

Defendant Attorney

BREM, MICHAEL LAMAR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2015
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2007
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2005
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2005
  • AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GARDNER, STEPHEN SHAYNE Person Filing - MOBILE CHEMICAL CO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2005
  • AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GARDNER, STEPHEN SHAYNE Person Filing - MOBILE OIL REFINING CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2004
  • FIFTEENTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GIBLIN, AARYN KEMP Person Filing - O'QUINN, CHARLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2004
  • THIRTY-THIRD AMENDED PETITION : Filing Attorney - GIBLIN, AARYN KEMP Person Filing - O'QUINN, CHARLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2004
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GIBLIN, AARYN KEMP Person Filing - O'QUINN, CHARLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GIBLIN, AARYN KEMP Person Filing - O'QUINN, CHARLIE

    Read MoreRead Less