This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:25:06 (UTC).

O'NEAL, DARREN KEITH vs. O'NEAL, MICHELLE YVETTE

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 O'NEAL, DARREN KEITH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against O'NEAL, MICHELLE YVETTE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1001

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

O'NEAL, DARREN KEITH

Defendant

O'NEAL, MICHELLE YVETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RHODES, WILLIE J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2005
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF WAIVER ORDER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2005
  • FOCAS PROJECT - DISQUALIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2005
  • FOCAS PROJECT - IN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2005
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2005
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2005
  • WAIVER CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2005
  • ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2005
  • TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2005
  • TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - RHODES, WILLIE J. Person Filing - O'NEAL, DARREN KEITH

    Read MoreRead Less