This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/08/2022 at 13:43:11 (UTC).

ONDIEKI, EDWARD MONYANCHA vs. FBI C/O TXDPS, EXPUNCTION UNIT (MSC-0234), CRIME R

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 ONDIEKI, EDWARD MONYANCHA filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against FBI C/O TXDPS, EXPUNCTION UNIT MSC-0234 , CRIME R. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is C. ELLIOTT THORNTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9112

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

C. ELLIOTT THORNTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONDIEKI, EDWARD MONYANCHA

Defendants

FBI C/O TXDPS, EXPUNCTION UNIT (MSC-0234), CRIME R

TXDPS, LEGAL SERVICES

P.O. Box 4087,

Austin, TX 78773

NCIC C/O TXDPS, EXPUNCTION UNIT (MSC-0234), CRIME RECORDS SERVICE

TCIC C/O TXDPS, EXPUNCTION UNIT (MSC-0234), CRIME RECORDS SERVICE

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY JAIL

HARRIS COUNTY COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE, CRIMINAL DIVISION

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY COUNTY ATTORNY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY ADULT PROBATION

HARRIS COUNTY COMMUNITY SUPERVISION & CORRECTIONS

HARRIS COUNTY COLLECTIONS

201 Caroline,

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY PRE-TRIAL SERVICES

HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES

HARRIS COUNTY GRAND JURY, CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER

JUSTICE INFORMATION MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS

41 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINSON, DOUGLAS WAYNE

Defendant Attorney

RISNER, BOBBIE K.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • HearingCourt: 164; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR); Results: Passed; Comments: SETTLED SHANNON 7/8/22 @ 2:12 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOTION FOR EXPUNCTION OF RECORDS PASSED;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RISNER, BOBBIE K.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ASSIGNED TO CLERK/NOT ISSUED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY COLLECTIONS; Tracking: 74013477; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMNAL JUSTICE - OFFICE OF THE GENERAL COUNSEL; Issued: 6/6/2022; Tracking: 74013469; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE; Issued: 6/6/2022; Tracking: 74013468; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MONTGOMERY COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE; Issued: 6/6/2022; Tracking: 74013467; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MONTGOMERY COUNTY COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE; Issued: 6/6/2022; Tracking: 74013466; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MONTGOMERY COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT/JAIL/INDETIFICATIN DIVISION/ALL D; Issued: 6/6/2022; Tracking: 74013465; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE, CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTIONS DIVISION; Issued: 6/6/2022; Tracking: 74013463; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 6/6/2022; Tracking: 74006662; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY JAIL BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 6/6/2022; Tracking: 74006661; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 6/6/2022; Tracking: 74006658; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 6/6/2022; Tracking: 74006657; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TCIC EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 6/6/2022; Tracking: 74006656; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: NCIC EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 6/6/2022; Tracking: 74006655; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 6/6/2022; Tracking: 74006654; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 6/6/2022; Tracking: 74006653; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 5/24/2022;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ATKINSON, DOUGLAS WAYNE; Person Filing: ONDIEKI, EDWARD MONYANCHA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JUSTICE INFORMATION MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY - COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY JAIL BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY is a litigant