This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/05/2020 at 07:18:56 (UTC).

OLIVER, BRENDAN vs. LIFETIME FITNESS INC

Case Summary

On 06/11/2020 OLIVER, BRENDAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LIFETIME FITNESS INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4986

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLIVER, BRENDAN

Defendants

TECHNOGYM USA CORP

LIFETIME FITNESS INC

GILCHRIST, CHRISTOPHER

Cypress, TX 77433

Others

TECHNOGYM USA CORP (A MANUFACTURING CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED

700 Us Highway 46

Fairfield, NJ 07004

LIFETIME FITNESS INC (A FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THURLOW, THOMAS N.

4900 Woodway Dr

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request For Disclosure

06/11/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request For Disclosure

Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Technogym USA Corp

06/11/2020: Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Technogym USA Corp

Plaintiff's Interrogatories To Defendant Life Time Fitness Inc

06/11/2020: Plaintiff's Interrogatories To Defendant Life Time Fitness Inc

Plaintiff's Request For Admissions To Defendant Technogym USA Corp

06/11/2020: Plaintiff's Request For Admissions To Defendant Technogym USA Corp

Plaintiff's Request For Production To Defendant

06/11/2020: Plaintiff's Request For Production To Defendant

Plaintiff's Request For Production To Defendant Technogym USA Corp

06/11/2020: Plaintiff's Request For Production To Defendant Technogym USA Corp

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

06/11/2020: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

06/11/2020: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

06/11/2020: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

Defendant's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ? 1446(c)

06/23/2020: Defendant's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ? 1446(c)

Service Return

06/17/2020: Service Return

Citation Return

06/17/2020: Citation Return

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GILCHRIST, CHRISTOPHER; Issued: 6/11/2020; Served: 6/15/2020; Tracking: 73757448; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (NON-RESIDENT CORPORATE); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TECHNOGYM USA CORP (A MANUFACTURING CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED; Issued: 6/11/2020; Tracking: 73757446; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LIFETIME FITNESS INC (A FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED; Issued: 6/11/2020; Served: 6/12/2020; Tracking: 73757444; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: THURLOW, THOMAS N.; Person Filing: OLIVER, BRENDAN;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lifetime Fitness Inc. d/b/a Life Time Fitness is a litigant

Latest cases where TECHNOGYM USA CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THURLOW, THOMAS N.