This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/09/2021 at 00:51:08 (UTC).

OGU, JOY vs. 99 CENTS ONLY STORE INC

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 OGU, JOY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 99 CENTS ONLY STORE INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN REEDER. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3454

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN REEDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OGU, JOY

Defendant

99 CENTS ONLY STORE INC

Other

99 CENTS ONLY STORE INC (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OMWIRHIREN, CYRIL-WESTCOTT AVBEROTIGHO

9525 Bissonet S

Houston, TX 77036

Defendant Attorney

GRIFFIN, MICHAEL JOHN III

3003 South Loop

Houston, TX 77054

 

Court Documents

Citation - 99 CENTS ONLY STORE INC

12/21/2020: Citation - 99 CENTS ONLY STORE INC

DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

01/14/2021: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

Civil Case Information Sheet

11/13/2020: Civil Case Information Sheet

Plaintiffs Original Petition

11/13/2020: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Defendant's Original Answer, Demand for Jury Trial and Request For Disclosure to Plaintiff

12/03/2020: Defendant's Original Answer, Demand for Jury Trial and Request For Disclosure to Plaintiff

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • HearingCourt: 234; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: Trial on Merits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 1/14/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GRIFFIN, MICHAEL JOHN III; Person Filing: 99 CENTS ONLY STORE INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: 99 CENTS ONLY STORE INC (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 11/16/2020; Served: 11/30/2020; Received: 12/19/2020; Tracking: 73811201; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: OMWIRHIREN, CYRIL-WESTCOTT AVBEROTIGHO; Person Filing: OGU, JOY;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 99 Cents Only Stores Texas, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRIFFIN III, MICHAEL JOHN