This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:22:41 (UTC).

OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL vs. ROCKAMORE, LANCE AMILLE

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against ROCKAMORE, LANCE AMILLE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JULIA MALDONADO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1458

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JULIA MALDONADO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

Defendants

ROCKAMORE, LANCE AMILLE

Cypress, TX 77433

MATHEWS, CHARMAINE HELEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AG CHILD SUPPORT, 618

6161 Savoy, Sui

Houston, TX 77036

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • HearingCourt: 993; Docket Type: Title IV-D Hearing (AG); Reason: MOTION FOR SUPPORT; Requesting Party: AG CHILD SUPPORT, 618

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: PRECEPT; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: MOTION (OTHER POST JUDGMENT); Person: ROCKAMORE, LANCE AMILLE; Issued: 6/5/2020; Tracking: 82896267; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: MOTION (OTHER POST JUDGMENT); Person: ROCKAMORE, LANCE AMILLE; Issued: 6/5/2020; Tracking: 82896266; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: PRECEPT; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: MOTION (OTHER POST JUDGMENT); Person: MATHEWS, CHARMAINE HELEN; Issued: 6/5/2020; Tracking: 82896261; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: MOTION (OTHER POST JUDGMENT); Person: MATHEWS, CHARMAINE HELEN; Issued: 6/5/2020; Tracking: 82896260; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: SENSITIVE DATA DOCUMENT; Order Signed: 5/26/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: SENSITIVE DATA DOCUMENT; Order Signed: 5/26/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: AG CHILD SUPPORT, 618; Person Filing: OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: IV-D MASTER SIGNED ORDER SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 5/26/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: IV-D MASTER SIGNED ORDER SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 5/26/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less