Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:42:25 (UTC).

OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL vs. MCCOY, MESHACH DAVON

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MCCOY, MESHACH DAVON. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SANDRA PEAKE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9505

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SANDRA PEAKE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

Defendants

DAVIS, DESIREE DASHUN

Houston, TX 77020

MCCOY, MESHACH DAVON

Houston, TX 77090

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AG CHILD SUPPORT, 616

6161 Savoy, Sui

Houston, TX 77036

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2020
  • HearingCourt: 991; Docket Type: Title IV-D Hearing (AG); Reason: PATERNITY MOTION FOR; Requesting Party: AG CHILD SUPPORT, 616

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: SENSITIVE DATA DOCUMENT; Order Signed: 3/27/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: SENSITIVE DATA DOCUMENT; Order Signed: 3/27/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: IV-D MASTER SIGNED ORDER SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 3/27/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: IV-D MASTER SIGNED ORDER SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 3/27/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: PRECEPT; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: MOTION (OTHER POST JUDGMENT); Person: DAVIS, DESIREE DASHUN; Issued: 4/16/2020; Served: 5/2/2020; Tracking: 82870834; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: MOTION (OTHER POST JUDGMENT); Person: DAVIS, DESIREE DASHUN; Issued: 4/16/2020; Served: 5/2/2020; Tracking: 82870833; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: PRECEPT; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: MOTION (OTHER POST JUDGMENT); Person: MCCOY, MESHACH DAVON; Issued: 4/16/2020; Served: 5/8/2020; Tracking: 82870830; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: MOTION (OTHER POST JUDGMENT); Person: MCCOY, MESHACH DAVON; Issued: 4/16/2020; Served: 5/8/2020; Tracking: 82870829; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: AG CHILD SUPPORT, 616; Person Filing: OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less