This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:25:00 (UTC).

OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL vs. BOLDEN, FREDERICK DORNELL

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against BOLDEN, FREDERICK DORNELL. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LINDA MARIE DUNSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1500

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LINDA MARIE DUNSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

Defendants

HAMPTON, MARILYN

Houston, TX 77075

BOLDEN, FREDERICK DORNELL

Houston, TX 77045

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AG CHILD SUPPORT, 617

6161 Savoy, Sui

Houston, TX 77036

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • HearingCourt: 992; Docket Type: Title IV-D Hearing (AG); Reason: MOTION FOR SUPPORT; Requesting Party: AG CHILD SUPPORT, 617

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: SENSITIVE DATA DOCUMENT; Order Signed: 5/27/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: SENSITIVE DATA DOCUMENT; Order Signed: 5/27/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: IV-D MASTER SIGNED ORDER SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 5/27/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: IV-D MASTER SIGNED ORDER SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 5/27/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: PRECEPT; Status: SERVICE ASSIGNED TO CLERK/NOT ISSUED; Instrument: MOTION (OTHER POST JUDGMENT); Person: HAMPTON, MARILYN; Tracking: 82896398; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ASSIGNED TO CLERK/NOT ISSUED; Instrument: MOTION (OTHER POST JUDGMENT); Person: HAMPTON, MARILYN; Tracking: 82896397; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: PRECEPT; Status: SERVICE ASSIGNED TO CLERK/NOT ISSUED; Instrument: MOTION (OTHER POST JUDGMENT); Person: BOLDEN, FREDERICK DORNELL; Tracking: 82896396; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ASSIGNED TO CLERK/NOT ISSUED; Instrument: MOTION (OTHER POST JUDGMENT); Person: BOLDEN, FREDERICK DORNELL; Tracking: 82896395; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: AG CHILD SUPPORT, 617; Person Filing: OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL;

    Read MoreRead Less