Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/29/2020 at 07:52:07 (UTC).

ODESSA PUMPS AND EQUIPMENT INC vs. BASIC ENERGY SERVICES L P

Case Summary

On 11/05/2020 ODESSA PUMPS AND EQUIPMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BASIC ENERGY SERVICES L P. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN REEDER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1531

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN REEDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ODESSA PUMPS AND EQUIPMENT INC

Defendant

BASIC ENERGY SERVICES L P

Other

BASIC ENERGY SERVICES L P (DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP) BY SERVING

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAKER, BRIAN ADDISON

 

Court Documents

Citation - BASIC ENERGY SERVICES L P

11/19/2020: Citation - BASIC ENERGY SERVICES L P

EXHIBIT A-1

11/05/2020: EXHIBIT A-1

EXHIBIT A

11/05/2020: EXHIBIT A

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

11/05/2020: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

Request for Issuance of Service

11/06/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BASIC ENERGY SERVICES L P (DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP) BY SERVING; Issued: 11/9/2020; Served: 11/11/2020; Received: 11/19/2020; Tracking: 73809388; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BAKER, BRIAN ADDISON; Person Filing: ODESSA PUMPS AND EQUIPMENT INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Basic Energy Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Odessa Pumps & Equipment, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Baker, Brian A