This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:25:28 (UTC).

O'CONNOR, DENNIS KEITH vs. O'CONNOR, JULIE ANN

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 O'CONNOR, DENNIS KEITH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against O'CONNOR, JULIE ANN. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1003

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

O'CONNOR, DENNIS KEITH

O'CONNOR, JULIE ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

COOPER, JAMES A.

GRIFFIN, CAROL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2011
  • FOCAS PROJECT - OUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2005
  • ORDER SGND GRNTG QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING ASSIGNMENT OF WAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2005
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED CHANGING NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2005
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2005
  • FOCAS PROJECT - IN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2005
  • MEDIATOR FEE AWARDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2005
  • TEMPORARY ORDER SIGNED WITH CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2005
  • COUNTER CLAIM : Filing Attorney - GRIFFIN, CAROL Person Filing - O'CONNOR, JULIE ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GRIFFIN, CAROL Person Filing - O'CONNOR, JULIE ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - COOPER, JAMES A. Person Filing - O'CONNOR, DENNIS KEITH

    Read MoreRead Less