Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:36:24 (UTC).

OCHOA, SARA vs. ORTIZ, KIANA B

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 OCHOA, SARA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ORTIZ, KIANA B. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KYLE CARTER. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9448

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KYLE CARTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OCHOA, SARA

Defendants

ORTIZ, KIANA B

Houston, TX 77017

ORTIZ, TEODORA P

Houston, TX 77017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WENDENBURG, AMANDA JO MYERS

Defendant Attorney

ZAJONC, STEPHEN PAUL

 

Court Documents

Citation (Teodora P Ortiz)

05/04/2020: Citation (Teodora P Ortiz)

Order on Def. Teodora P. Ortiz Original Answe, Jury Demand and S.E.

05/07/2020: Order on Def. Teodora P. Ortiz Original Answe, Jury Demand and S.E.

Defendant Teodora P. Ortiz Original Answer, Jury Demand and Special Exception

05/07/2020: Defendant Teodora P. Ortiz Original Answer, Jury Demand and Special Exception

TRIAL SETTING

05/28/2020: TRIAL SETTING

Proposed Order Authorizing Substituted Service

06/10/2020: Proposed Order Authorizing Substituted Service

Notice of Submission

06/10/2020: Notice of Submission

Exhibit A

06/10/2020: Exhibit A

Plaintiff's Motion for Substitute Service

06/10/2020: Plaintiff's Motion for Substitute Service

Request for Issuance of Service

03/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

03/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE TO DEFENDANT TEODORA

03/26/2020: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE TO DEFENDANT TEODORA

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE TO DEFENDANT KIANA B

03/26/2020: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE TO DEFENDANT KIANA B

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT KIANA

03/26/2020: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT KIANA

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT KIANA

03/26/2020: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT KIANA

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT KIANA

03/26/2020: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT KIANA

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

03/26/2020: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • HearingCourt: 125; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: Trial on Merits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • HearingCourt: 125; Docket Type: Trial Coordinators Docket; Reason: DOCKET CALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ZAJONC, STEPHEN PAUL; Person Filing: ORTIZ, TEODORA P;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ORTIZ, TEODORA P; Issued: 3/27/2020; Served: 4/25/2020; Tracking: 73738568; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ORTIZ, KIANA B; Issued: 3/27/2020; Tracking: 73738567; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WENDENBURG, AMANDA JO MYERS; Person Filing: OCHOA, SARA;

    Read MoreRead Less