This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/29/2022 at 07:27:35 (UTC).

OCHOA, JESSE vs. HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

Case Summary

On 12/05/2022 OCHOA, JESSE filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BRITTANYE MORRIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8792

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BRITTANYE MORRIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OCHOA, JESSE

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY CRIME RECORDS SERVICE MSC 0234

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT

OCA EXPUNCTIONS-LEGAL DIVISIONS

HOUSTON FORENSIC SCIENCE CENTER

Others

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L. ROSE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

HARRIS COUNTY PRE-TRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L. BANKS DIRECTOR

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING RHONDA A. REECE

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SILVERMAN, JED ROSS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/21/2023

HearingCourt: 333; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2022

DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOUSTON FORENSIC SCIENCE CENTER; Issued: 12/22/2022; Tracking: 74092323; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2022

DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION; Issued: 12/22/2022; Tracking: 74088658; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2022

DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING RHONDA A. REECE; Issued: 12/22/2022; Tracking: 74088655; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2022

DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRE-TRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L. BANKS DIRECTOR; Issued: 12/22/2022; Tracking: 74088654; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2022

DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 12/22/2022; Tracking: 74088652; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2022

DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L. ROSE; Issued: 12/22/2022; Tracking: 74088650; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2022

DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY; Issued: 12/22/2022; Tracking: 74088649; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2022

DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 12/22/2022; Tracking: 74088648; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2022

DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 12/14/2022;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2022

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SILVERMAN, JED ROSS; Person Filing: OCHOA, JESSE;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less