This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/09/2020 at 07:40:11 (UTC).

OCEANEERING INTERNATIONAL INC vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 09/15/2020 OCEANEERING INTERNATIONAL INC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE H PALMER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6358

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE H PALMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OCEANEERING INTERNATIONAL INC

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS

13013 Northwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77009

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SALLUSTI, AMY REILLY

 

Court Documents

Citation

10/02/2020: Citation

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

09/15/2020: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

Request for Issuance of Service

09/15/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 9/15/2020; Served: 9/24/2020; Tracking: 73787731; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SALLUSTI, AMY REILLY; Person Filing: OCEANEERING INTERNATIONAL INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Oceaneering International Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy R Sallusti