This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/06/2021 at 23:26:32 (UTC).

OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION vs. TEXAS BRINE COMPANY LLC

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TEXAS BRINE COMPANY LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are DARYL L. MOORE and BRITTANYE MORRIS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2352

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

DARYL L. MOORE

BRITTANYE MORRIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION

Defendant

TEXAS BRINE COMPANY LLC

4800 San Felipe Street

Houston, TX 77056

Others

TEXAS BRINE COMPANY LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

4800 San Felipe Street

Houston, TX 77056

ALL INTERESTED PARTIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MIZELL, PATRICK W.

1001 Fannin St

Houston, TX 77002

PATRICK, KATHY D

1100 Louisiana

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

MAYER, ERIC J.

1000 Louisiana

Houston, TX 77002

GARNER, JAMES M.

909 Poydras St

New Orlean, LA 70112

 

Court Documents

Texas Brine's Unopposed Amended Motion for Temporary And Permanent Sealing Order

11/26/2018: Texas Brine's Unopposed Amended Motion for Temporary And Permanent Sealing Order

Occidental Chemical Corporations Supplement To Record On Occidental Chemical Corporations Motion To Compel Arbitration And Texas Brines Motion To Dismiss For Forum Non Conveniens

12/04/2018: Occidental Chemical Corporations Supplement To Record On Occidental Chemical Corporations Motion To Compel Arbitration And Texas Brines Motion To Dismiss For Forum Non Conveniens

EXHIBIT B

09/24/2019: EXHIBIT B

Proposed Order granting Motion to Stay Pending Arbitration

09/25/2019: Proposed Order granting Motion to Stay Pending Arbitration

Designation of Attorney In Charge

10/14/2019: Designation of Attorney In Charge

Designation Of Attroney In Charge

10/14/2019: Designation Of Attroney In Charge

Exhibit 02

07/31/2017: Exhibit 02

Exhibit 01

07/31/2017: Exhibit 01

Notice of Filing of Amended Proposed Order

08/02/2017: Notice of Filing of Amended Proposed Order

Texas Brine Company, LLC'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

08/15/2017: Texas Brine Company, LLC'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

Proposed Permanent Sealing Order

03/07/2018: Proposed Permanent Sealing Order

Proposed Temporary Sealing Order

03/08/2018: Proposed Temporary Sealing Order

Proposed Order

08/13/2018: Proposed Order

Proposed Temporary Sealing Order

10/03/2018: Proposed Temporary Sealing Order

Exhibit 26

10/03/2018: Exhibit 26

Verification of Posting of Notice

10/04/2018: Verification of Posting of Notice

Verification of Texas Brine's unopposed motion for temporary and permanent sealing order.

10/04/2018: Verification of Texas Brine's unopposed motion for temporary and permanent sealing order.

TEXAS BRINES UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR TEMPORARY AND PERMANENT SEALING ORDER

10/04/2018: TEXAS BRINES UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR TEMPORARY AND PERMANENT SEALING ORDER

257 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • HearingCourt: 333; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; Results: Granted; Comments: O/S; Requesting Party: CRUSE, SAM W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketDescription: CASE ABATED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED STAYING PROCEEDINGS; Order Signed: 10/21/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD; Order Signed: 7/23/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • HearingCourt: 333; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: STATUS CONFERENCE; Results: Passed; Comments: STATUS REPORT SUBMIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • HearingCourt: 333; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: MTN TO SEAL; Results: Granted; Comments: O/S; Requesting Party: WILSON, DANIEL ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • HearingCourt: 333; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: MTN TO SEAL; Results: Granted; Requesting Party: PATRICK, KATHY DAWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • HearingCourt: 333; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: MTN TO SEAL; Results: Passed; Comments: PER LIZ MILLER ON 10.26.18; Requesting Party: WILSON, DANIEL ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE (SHORT FORM); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ALL INTERESTED PARTIES; Issued: 11/1/2018; Tracking: 73559136; Deliver To: CIV AGCY-CIVILIAN SERVICE AGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SEALING DOCUMENT(S) SIGNED; Order Signed: 10/23/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2017
  • HearingCourt: 333; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: STATUS CONFERENCE; Results: Hearing Held; Requesting Party: YEATES, MARIE ROACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • HearingCourt: 333; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: MTN TO SEAL; Results: Granted; Requesting Party: YEATES, MARIE ROACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SEALING DOCUMENT(S) IN PART SIGNED SEE ORDER; Order Signed: 6/30/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION BY POSTING (CIVIL); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ALL INTERESTED PARTIES; Issued: 6/16/2017; Served: 6/16/2017; Returned: 7/5/2017; Tracking: 73384734; Deliver To: CONST 1 ALAN ROSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • HearingCourt: 333; Docket Type: Trial Coordinators Docket; Reason: DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A); Results: Passed; Comments: DUPLICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • HearingCourt: 333; Docket Type: Trial Coordinators Docket; Reason: DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A); Results: Passed; Comments: DUPLICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • HearingCourt: 333; Docket Type: Trial Coordinators Docket; Reason: DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A); Results: Passed; Comments: DUPLICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketDescription: CASE ABATED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS BRINE COMPANY LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 2/26/2016; Served: 3/1/2016; Returned: 3/2/2016; Tracking: 73220633; Deliver To: CIV AGCY-CIVILIAN SERVICE AGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MIZELL, PATRICK W.; Person Filing: OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEXAS BRINE COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where All Interested Parties is a litigant

Latest cases where OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAYER , ERIC J