This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 01/14/2022 at 07:23:30 (UTC).

O'BRIEN, DAVID (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT OF FRIEND OF O, S) (A MNIOR) vs. ST LUKE'S HEALTH SYSTEM (D/B/A ST LUKE'S HEALTH-THE VINTAGE)

Case Summary

On 12/21/2021 O'BRIEN, DAVID INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT OF FRIEND OF O, S A MNIOR filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ST LUKE'S HEALTH SYSTEM D/B/A ST LUKE'S HEALTH-THE VINTAGE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT K. SCHAFFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2688

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT K. SCHAFFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

O'BRIEN, DAVID (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT OF FRIEND OF O, S) (A MNIOR)

O, S (A MINOR)

Defendants

ST LUKE'S HEALTH SYSTEM (D/B/A ST LUKE'S HEALTH-THE VINTAGE)

ST LUKE'S HEALTH-THE VINTAGE

Other

ST LUKE'S HEALTH SYSTEM (D/B/A ST LUKE'S HEALTH-THE VINTAGE) (DOMESTIC

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEYCER, MARK A.

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Original Petition Jury Demand and Request for Disclosure

12/21/2021: Plaintiffs Original Petition Jury Demand and Request for Disclosure

Civil Case Information Sheet

12/21/2021: Civil Case Information Sheet

Request for Issuance of Service

12/21/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Citation Corporate Return

01/06/2022: Citation Corporate Return

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ST LUKE'S HEALTH SYSTEM (D/B/A ST LUKE'S HEALTH-THE VINTAGE) (DOMESTIC; Issued: 12/22/2021; Served: 1/3/2022; Tracking: 73954585; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WEYCER, MARK A.; Person Filing: O, S (A MINOR);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WEYCER, MARK A.; Person Filing: O'BRIEN, DAVID (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT OF FRIEND OF O, S) (A MNIOR);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST LUKE'S HEALTH SYSTEM CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEYCER, MARK A.