Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/14/2015 at 21:12:06 (UTC).

OAXACA, PATRICIA vs. A W CHESTERTON

Case Summary

On 05/13/2005 OAXACA, PATRICIA filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2971

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2005

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OAXACA, PATRICIA

OAXACA, FRANK

Defendants

A W CHESTERTON

AMERICAN STANDARD INC

AQUA CHEM INC (DBA CLEAVER BROOKS DIVISION)

CLEAVER BROOKS DIVISION

BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC (FKA D B RILEY INC FKA RILEY STOKER

D B RILEY INC

RILEY STOKER CORPORATION

BUFFALO PUMPS INC

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

CRANE COMPANY

CROWN CORK AND SEAL COMPANY INC

DANA CORPORATIONS

DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY INC

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES LLC

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

GEORGE PACIFIC CORPORATION

GOODRICH CORPORATION

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATHEN, FRANK J. II

Defendant Attorneys

JACKSON, JESSICA S.

OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR.

WHITE, CLAY M.

ELLISTON, GARY D.

POWERS, JAMES H.

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

FOLEY, JAMES THOMAS III

HARDING, LISA D.

LYNN, LAWRENCE A.

HARRIS, RAYMOND PAUL JR.

FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM

BAILEY, MELVIN DAVID

MAGUIRE, KEVIN J.

Other Attorneys

FULLER, L. HAYES III

PRAZAK, JONATHAN R

FRASE, LAURA ANN

RHODES, KENNETH D.

MOIR, PETER A.

BOYD, ERNEST W

5 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2013
  • PARTIAL REMOVAL TO BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - BUFFALO PUMPS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WELCH, JOHN BRUCE Person Filing - ZURN INDUSTRIES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BOYD, ERNEST W Person Filing - SEPCO CORPORATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BALDO, NICHOLAS S. Person Filing - OAKFABCO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2005
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - BALDO, NICHOLAS S. Person Filing - OAKFABCO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FRASE, LAURA ANN Person Filing - INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HENDRYX, MICHAEL Person Filing - VIACOM INC (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FARRELL, WILLIAM HOWARD Person Filing - GUARD-LINE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - D B RILEY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MOIR, PETER A. Person Filing - OWENS ILLINOIS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LYNN, LAWRENCE A. Person Filing - FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2005
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - FULLER, L. HAYES III Person Filing - GOULDS PUMPS INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - KAISER GYPSUM CO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FULLER, L. HAYES III Person Filing - GOULDS PUMPS INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2005
  • MOTION TRANSFER VENUE : Filing Attorney - LOFTIN, STEPHEN MCBRIDE Person Filing - T H AGRICULTURE & NUTRITION LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LOFTIN, STEPHEN MCBRIDE Person Filing - T H AGRICULTURE & NUTRITION LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLACK, LOU THOMPSON Person Filing - OAXACA, FRANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM Person Filing - GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLACK, LOU THOMPSON Person Filing - OAXACA, PATRICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DANA CORPORATIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where BUFFALO PUMPS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY is a litigant