This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 11:42:32 (UTC).

NORTHWEST BUSINESS PLLP (AS THE PROPERTY vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 NORTHWEST BUSINESS PLLP AS THE PROPERTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7389

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NORTHWEST BUSINESS PLLP (AS THE PROPERTY OWNERS)

PROPERTY OWNERS

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD OF HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCKENNEY, HUGH L.

Defendant Attorney

STEWART, G. TODD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2005
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2005
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2004
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - STEWART, G. TODD Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCKENNEY, HUGH L. Person Filing - PROPERTY OWNERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCKENNEY, HUGH L. Person Filing - NORTHWEST BUSINESS PLLP (AS THE PROPERTY OWNERS)

    Read MoreRead Less