This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2021 at 08:00:46 (UTC).

NIETO-ORNELAS, ANGELICA ALE vs. HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT AND JAIL

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 NIETO-ORNELAS, ANGELICA ALE filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT AND JAIL. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL GOMEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1397

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL GOMEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NIETO-ORNELAS, ANGELICA ALE

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT AND JAIL

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK

HARRIS COUNTY COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS DEPARTMENT

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER

FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, CRIMNAL JUSTICE INFORMATION SERVICES

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT AND JAIL, CITY OF HOUSTON

Others

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker St

Houston, TX 77011

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE

1310 Prairie, 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

COMMUNITY SUPERVISION & CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR. TERESA MAY PHD

49 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALDERON, WILLIAM DIAZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • HearingCourt: 129; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS; Issued: 6/14/2021; Tracking: 73879760; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 6/14/2021; Tracking: 73879759; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 6/14/2021; Tracking: 73879758; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 6/14/2021; Tracking: 73879757; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COMMUNITY SUPERVISION & CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR. TERESA MAY PHD; Issued: 6/14/2021; Tracking: 73879756; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 6/14/2021; Tracking: 73879755; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 6/14/2021; Tracking: 73879754; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 6/14/2021; Tracking: 73879753; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE; Issued: 6/14/2021; Tracking: 73879752; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 6/14/2021; Tracking: 73879750; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 6/9/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CALDERON, WILLIAM DIAZ; Person Filing: NIETO-ORNELAS, ANGELICA ALE;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS DEPARMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD is a litigant