This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:13:52 (UTC).

NEW REGIONAL PLANNING INC vs. MOUSA, CHAYN

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 NEW REGIONAL PLANNING INC filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against MOUSA, CHAYN. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0646

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

NEW REGIONAL PLANNING INC

MOUSA, CHAYN

TARTT, BLAKE III

TARGET CORPORATION

DIMENSIONAL INVESTMENTS INC (DBA DIMENSIONAL INVESTMENTS REAL ESTATE

DIMENSIONAL INVESTMENTS REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT COMPANY

DIMENSIONAL INVESTMENTS INC

FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

MARRS, SCOTT D.

FASTHOFF, HENRY JAMES IV

MCFARLAND, CHARLES BLACK

PEACOCK, JAMES HOKE III

PRUITT, PAUL D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2007
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2007
  • ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2007
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING PREFERENTIAL TRIAL SETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCFARLAND, CHARLES BLACK Person Filing - TARGET CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PRUITT, PAUL D. Person Filing - FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FASTHOFF, HENRY JAMES IV Person Filing - DIMENSIONAL INVESTMENTS REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FASTHOFF, HENRY JAMES IV Person Filing - DIMENSIONAL INVESTMENTS INC (DBA DIMENSIONAL INVESTMENTS REAL ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FASTHOFF, HENRY JAMES IV Person Filing - MOUSA, CHAYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FASTHOFF, HENRY JAMES IV Person Filing - DIMENSIONAL INVESTMENTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MARRS, SCOTT D. Person Filing - NEW REGIONAL PLANNING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MARRS, SCOTT D. Person Filing - TARTT, BLAKE III

    Read MoreRead Less