This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/08/2021 at 07:35:10 (UTC).

NELSON, NICHOLAS vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 NELSON, NICHOLAS filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DAWN ROGERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5652

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DAWN ROGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NELSON, NICHOLAS

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

HARRIS COUNTY INSTITUTE OF FORENSIC SCIENCE

Others

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77011

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L. ROSE

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMS, KRYSTAL JERE'

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2021
  • HearingCourt: 334; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY INSTITUTE OF FORENSIC SCIENCE; Issued: 7/1/2021; Tracking: 73886141; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR; Issued: 7/1/2021; Tracking: 73883746; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 7/1/2021; Tracking: 73883745; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L. ROSE; Issued: 7/1/2021; Tracking: 73883744; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 7/1/2021; Tracking: 73883743; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 7/1/2021; Tracking: 73883742; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 6/25/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WILLIAMS, KRYSTAL JERE'; Person Filing: NELSON, NICHOLAS;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY INSTITUTE OF FORENSIC SCIENCES is a litigant

Latest cases where OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION - LEGAL DIVISION is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT is a litigant