This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/22/2022 at 16:33:00 (UTC).

NELSON-GRIFFIN, VELMA vs. CENTERPOINT ENERGY INC

Case Summary

On 07/07/2022 NELSON-GRIFFIN, VELMA filed an Other lawsuit against CENTERPOINT ENERGY INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINE WEEMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0594

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINE WEEMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NELSON-GRIFFIN, VELMA

Defendants

CENTERPOINT ENERGY INC

NRG ENERGY INC

AIR LIQUID LARGE INDUSTRIES US LP (RE)

ALAMO 6 LLC (RE)

AMADEUS WIND LLC (RE)

ANACACHO WIND FARM LLC (RE)

ASTRA WIND LLC (RE)

AVANGRID TEXAS RENEWABLES LLC

AVIATOR WIND LLC

BEARKAT WIND ENERGY I LLC

BHER POWER RESOURCES INC (RE)

BLUE SUMMIT III WIND LLC

BLUE SUMMIT STORAGE LLC (RE)

BLUE SUMMIT WIND LLC (RE)

BRAZOS WIND VENTURES LLC (RE)

BROWNSVILLE PUBLIC UTILITIES BOARD SILAS RAY (AKA PUBLIC UTILITIES

BRUENNINGS BREEZE WIND FARM LLC (RE)

BRYAN TEXAS UTILITIES (RE)

BT COOKE SOLAR LLC (RE)

284 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPAGNOLETTI, MARCUS R

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition

07/07/2022: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Exhibit A

07/07/2022: Exhibit A

Exhibit B

07/07/2022: Exhibit B

Exhibit C

07/07/2022: Exhibit C

Civil process Citation Request - ERCOT

07/25/2022: Civil process Citation Request - ERCOT

Proposed Order

07/22/2022: Proposed Order

Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit without Prejudice

07/20/2022: Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit without Prejudice

Notice of Suggestion of Bankruptcy

07/12/2022: Notice of Suggestion of Bankruptcy

Exhibit A

07/12/2022: Exhibit A

CITATION RETURN - TRACKING NUMBER 74030034 - (ELECTRIC RELIABILITY OF TEXAS)

08/03/2022: CITATION RETURN - TRACKING NUMBER 74030034 - (ELECTRIC RELIABILITY OF TEXAS)

ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED

08/08/2022: ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED

Civil Process Request Form

11/10/2022: Civil Process Request Form

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CENTERPOINT ENERGY INC (FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE; Issued: 11/17/2022; Tracking: 74079612; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 8/8/2022;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ELECTRIC RELIABILITY OF TEXAS BY SERVING THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 7/25/2022; Served: 7/28/2022; Received: 8/3/2022; Tracking: 74030034; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: PARTIAL REMOVAL TO BANKRUPTCY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SPAGNOLETTI, MARCUS R; Person Filing: NELSON-GRIFFIN, VELMA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: REFERRED TO PRE-TRIAL COURT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less