This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:24:10 (UTC).

NEDD, CHERRILYN vs. FARMERS GROUP INC (AND/OR DBA AND/OR AKA

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 NEDD, CHERRILYN filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FARMERS GROUP INC AND/OR DBA AND/OR AKA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8651

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEDD, CHERRILYN

Defendants

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS (DOING BUSINESS UNDER THE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERBERT, ADRIENNE ELIZABETH

Defendant Attorney

VON STERNBERG, CRAIG

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2006
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2006
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR DEFENDANT (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED, CASE RETAINED ON DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2005
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL ANSWER : Filing Attorney - VON STERNBERG, CRAIG Person Filing - MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL ANSWER : Filing Attorney - VON STERNBERG, CRAIG Person Filing - MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS (DOING BUSINESS UNDER THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2005
  • ORD SGND GRNTING MTN TO SUBSTITUTE MEDIATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2005
  • ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2005
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2005
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - VON STERNBERG, CRAIG Person Filing - FARMERS GROUP INC (AND/OR DBA AND/OR AKA FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - VON STERNBERG, CRAIG Person Filing - MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS (DOING BUSINESS UNDER THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - VON STERNBERG, CRAIG Person Filing - TEXAS FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY (DOING BUSINESS UNDER THE ASSUMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SHERBERT, ADRIENNE ELIZABETH Person Filing - NEDD, CHERRILYN

    Read MoreRead Less